Triple B Corporation v Organic Fresh Fingers Inc et al
Plaintiff: Triple B Corporation, dba Charlie's Produce and Triple B Corporation
Defendant: Evann Remington, Organic Fresh Fingers, Inc., dba Fresh N'Local Foods and Organic Fresh Fingers Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01665
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Organic Fresh Fingers' #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant Organic Fresh Fingers Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is 1/15/2019. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Second Amended), filed by Defendant Organic Fresh Fingers Inc. Noting Date 1/11/2019, (Ricks, Douglas)
December 31, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Organic Fresh Fingers Inc. Noting Date 1/11/2019, (Ricks, Douglas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Evann Remington on 11/21/2018, filed by Plaintiff Triple B Corporation. (Hilton, Kristen)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Organic Fresh Fingers, Inc. on 11/21/2018, filed by Plaintiff Triple B Corporation. (Hilton, Kristen)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #8 Stipulated Motion to Extend the Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is 12/31/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant Organic Fresh Fingers Inc. (Ricks, Douglas)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 2/26/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey C Misley on behalf of Plaintiff Triple B Corporation. (Misley, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Organic Fresh Fingers, Evann Remington (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ST)
November 19, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Triple B Corporation, dba Charlie's Produce (Hilton, Kristen)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Organic Fresh Fingers, Inc., dba Fresh N'Local Foods, Evann Remington (Receipt # 0981-5546537), filed by Triple B Corporation, dba Charlie's Produce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hilton, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triple B Corporation v Organic Fresh Fingers Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evann Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Fresh Fingers, Inc., dba Fresh N'Local Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic Fresh Fingers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple B Corporation, dba Charlie's Produce
Represented By: Kristen Grace Hilton
Represented By: Jeffrey C Misley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple B Corporation
Represented By: Kristen Grace Hilton
Represented By: Jeffrey C Misley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?