Alderson v. JetBlue Airways Corporation

Plaintiff: Lynda Alderson
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01711
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *4-5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 2/10/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 2/8/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 2/8/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/14/2019, Motions due by 9/13/2019, Discovery completed by 10/15/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/12/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/27/2019, Motions in Limine due by 1/13/2020, Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/5/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/5/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4-5. (Pitsch, Samantha)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Pitsch, Samantha)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/27/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/3/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
November 29, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant JetBlue Airways Corporation (Pitsch, Samantha)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Jorgensen, Caryn)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Samantha Pitsch re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant JetBlue Airways Corporation (Jorgensen, Caryn)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-27123-1 KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5559586), filed by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Jorgensen, Caryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alderson v. JetBlue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Alderson
Represented By: Justin M Dale
Represented By: Michael D Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Samantha K Pitsch
Represented By: John T Fetters
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?