United States of Amercia v. Paul

Plaintiff: United States of Amercia and United States of America
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Carmela Paul, IndyMac Bank, F.S.B., The Port of Seattle, Seattle Savings Bank, FilMar Ministry, KeyBank, N.A., Ronald M Paul, IndyMac Bank FSB, KeyBank National Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01712
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Stay: This case is stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. All current deadlines, including the deadlines in the Court's 1/3/2019 order (Dkt. #2 ), will be extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LW)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/25/2019, (Hines, Erin)
January 11, 2019 ***Motion terminated: #4 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed by United States of America. Please disregard. Counsel to refile motion and proposed order, per phone call. (PM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISREGARD. Counsel to refile documents. MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/25/2019, (Hines, Erin) Modified on 1/11/2019 (PM).
January 8, 2019 Attorney Steven Joseph Dixson added for Nationstar Mortgage LLC per #3 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher G. Varallo on behalf of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Varallo, Christopher)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
November 29, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Erin R Hines added to party United States of Amercia(pty:pla), filed by United States of Amercia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hines, Erin) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of Amercia v. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmela Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Port of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FilMar Ministry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of Amercia
Represented By: Erin R Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erin R Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?