Jacobson v. Soo Line Railroad et al

Plaintiff: Teresa Jacobson
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company and Soo Line Railroad
Case Number: 2:2018cv01722
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 6 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Soo Line Railroad (SWT)
January 25, 2019 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS SOO Line by Plaintiff Teresa Jacobson (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Mitchell, Wayne)
January 4, 2019 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant BNSF Railway Company mailed on 12/11/2018 (Mitchell, Wayne)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Luke Pepper for Teresa Jacobson, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
December 3, 2018 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
December 3, 2018 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Luke Pepper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Teresa Jacobson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5565281 (Mitchell, Wayne)
November 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5563230) Attorney Wayne Mitchell added to party Teresa Jacobson(pty:pla), filed by Teresa Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobson v. Soo Line Railroad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Jacobson
Represented By: Wayne Mitchell
Represented By: Luke Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?