Hopkins v. Integon General Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Daniel Hopkins
Defendant: Integon General Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01723
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *6-8 DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 4/13/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/16/2019, Motions due by 10/16/2019, Discovery completed by 11/15/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/16/2019, Motions in Limine due by 3/9/2020, Pretrial Order due by 4/1/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/1/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/1/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
January 15, 2019 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 6-8. (Harris, Eliot)
December 6, 2018 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent National General Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent National General Management Corp. for Integon General Insurance Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Integon General Insurance Corporation (Harris, Eliot)
December 6, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eliot M Harris on behalf of Defendant Integon General Insurance Corporation. (Harris, Eliot)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/2/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/8/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
December 3, 2018 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
December 3, 2018 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/10/2018. (SNP)
December 3, 2018 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
November 30, 2018 3 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Integon General Insurance Corporation (Kang, Jean)
November 30, 2018 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Integon General Insurance Corporation (Kang, Jean)
November 30, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-26081-7-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5563267), filed by Integon General Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kang, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Integon General Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integon General Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Clifford J. Wilson
Represented By: Jean Y. Kang
Represented By: Eliot M Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hopkins
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?