Puget Soundkeeper Alliance v. City of Anacortes

Plaintiff: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance
Defendant: Anacortes City of and City of Anacortes
Case Number: 2:2018cv01745
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10. (Englebrecht, Alyssa)
January 24, 2019 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katelyn J. Kinn on behalf of Plaintiff Puget Soundkeeper Alliance. (Kinn, Katelyn)
January 10, 2019 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by City of Anacortes.(Terry, Lori)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/17/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/24/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
December 18, 2018 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #5 Notice of Appearance. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (PM)
December 18, 2018 Attorney Joanne C Kalas added as counsel for City of Anacortes per #5 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
December 17, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lori A Terry on behalf of Defendant City of Anacortes. (Terry, Lori)
December 14, 2018 4 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Lori Terry, on behalf of City of Anacortes, on 12/10/2018. (Englebrecht, Alyssa)
December 10, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Puget Soundkeeper Alliance (Englebrecht, Alyssa)
December 10, 2018 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Anacortes (SNP)
December 10, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/17/2018. (SNP)
December 10, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Anacortes City of (Receipt # 0981-5568870), filed by Puget Soundkeeper Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Englebrecht, Alyssa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance v. City of Anacortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anacortes City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Anacortes
Represented By: Joanne C Kalas
Represented By: Lori A Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Richard Adam Smith
Represented By: Alyssa Lee Englebrecht
Represented By: Katelyn J. Kinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?