Dominicci v. Jack Henry & Associates Inc

Plaintiff: Jennifer Dominicci
Defendant: Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. and Jack Henry & Associates Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01746
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/28/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/1/2019, Motions due by 5/31/2019, Discovery completed by 7/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 7/30/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/13/2019, Motions in Limine due by 9/30/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/16/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/23/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/23/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
January 15, 2019 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-4. Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Dominicci.(Rocke, Aaron)
December 17, 2018 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Jennifer Dominicci (Rocke, Aaron)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/10/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
December 6, 2018 6 ANSWER to Complaint; And Affirmative Defenses by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc..(Johnsrud, Barry)
December 6, 2018 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
December 6, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
December 6, 2018 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal From King County Superior Court by Defendant Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. (Johnsrud, Barry)
December 5, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. (Johnsrud, Barry)
December 5, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Sherry Talton in Support of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Jack Henry & Associates, Inc. (Johnsrud, Barry)
December 5, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-54669-9; (Receipt # 0981-5568976), filed by Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnsrud, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominicci v. Jack Henry & Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Henry & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Alan Johnsrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Henry & Associates Inc
Represented By: Barry Alan Johnsrud
Represented By: Sherry L. Talton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dominicci
Represented By: Aaron Vincent Rocke
Represented By: Peter Montine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?