Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Jennifer Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2018cv01747
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on on 1/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martinez, Janet)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (KEB)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Jennifer Jackson.(KEB)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge David W. Christel.(KEB)
December 6, 2018 Judge David W. Christel added. (SNP)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KEB)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Jennifer Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons)(Martinez, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jackson
Represented By: Janet Leanne Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?