Wilcox v. Hamilton Manufacturing Inc et al

Plaintiff: James W. Wilcox and James Wilcox
Defendant: Hamilton Manufacturing, Inc., Hamilton Construction LLC, Hamilton Marine Construction LLC and Hamilton Manufacturing Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01756
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Lawrence Black, III on behalf of Defendant Hamilton Marine Construction LLC. (Black, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Hamilton Construction LLC mailed on 12/17/2018 (Merriam, John)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Hamilton Manufacturing Inc mailed on 12/17/2018 (Merriam, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Hamilton Manufacturing Inc, Hamilton Construction LLC, and Hamilton Marine Construction LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(GT)
December 11, 2018 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seaman's Complaint for Personal Injuries, Wages, Maintenance and Cure-All Without Payment of Costs, 28 USC sec 1916 against defendant(s) Hamilton Construction LLC, Hamilton Manufacturing, Inc., Hamilton Marine Construction LLC, filed by James W. Wilcox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe for a Summons, #3 Summons Hamilton Manufacturing, Inc., #4 Summons Hamilton Manufacturing, Inc.-Registered Agent, #5 Summons Hamilton Construction LLC, #6 Summons Hamilton Construction LLC-Registered Agent, #7 Summons Hamilton Marine Construction LLC, #8 Summons Hamilton Marine Construction LLC-Registered Agent)(Merriam, John) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Hamilton Manufacturing Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Marine Construction LLC
Represented By: William Lawrence Black, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Wilcox
Represented By: John W Merriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilcox
Represented By: John W Merriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?