Mansour et al v. British Airways PLC et al

Plaintiff: Abdul Mansour and Julia Mansour
Defendant: British Airways PLC, Huntleigh USA Corp and Huntleigh USA Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01757
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to BJR. (KMP)
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ICTS International N.V. for Huntleigh USA Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation (Northcraft, Mark)
January 11, 2019 Attorney Kelly Ann Mennemeier for British Airways PLC added; per #15 Notice of Appearance. (KMP)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent International Consolidated Airlines Group, S.A. for British Airways PLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by British Airways PLC (Block, Steven)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven William Block on behalf of Defendant British Airways PLC. (Block, Steven)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER RESCHEDULING JOINT STATUS REPORT DEADLINE AND RELATED DATES by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/18/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2019. Declination of Consent Deadline (see Dkt. #9 ) is also extended to 2/25/2019. (KMP)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER of Huntleigh USA Corporation by Plaintiffs Abdul Mansour, Julia Mansour (Smith, Franklin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant British Airways PLC mailed on 12/17/2018 (Smith, Franklin)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark S. Northcraft on behalf of Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Northcraft, Mark)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/9/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/16/2019. (KMP)
December 12, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #9 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. Plaintiff's counsel (or Plaintiff, if pro se) is directed to serve a copy of the consent form on counsel for any party subsequently appearing within five (5) days of an appearance of counsel for that party. (KMP)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 1/23/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants British Airways PLC, Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Huntleigh USA Corp)(KMP)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS AMENDED by Plaintiffs Abdul Mansour, Julia Mansour (Smith, Franklin)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Huntleigh USA Corporation by Plaintiffs Abdul Mansour, Julia Mansour (Smith, Franklin)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS British Airways, PLC by Plaintiffs Abdul Mansour, Julia Mansour (Smith, Franklin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #3 Praecipe for a Summons, #2 Praecipe for a Summons. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
December 11, 2018 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (ST)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Abdul Mansour (Smith, Franklin)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Abdul Mansour (Smith, Franklin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs Mansour against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5571974), filed by Abdul Mansour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Franklin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansour et al v. British Airways PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Airways PLC
Represented By: Kelly Ann Mennemeier
Represented By: Steven William Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntleigh USA Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntleigh USA Corporation
Represented By: Mark S. Northcraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul Mansour
Represented By: Franklin L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Mansour
Represented By: Franklin L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?