Berry v. Holbrook

Petitioner: Daryl Lamar Berry
Respondent: Donald R Holbrook
Case Number: 2:2018cv01763
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: James L Robart
1 Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 5 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is incomplete. Please answer all the questions on the enclosed application and return it to the Court as soon as possible. Filer has until 1/14/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daryl Berry, Prisoner ID: 879625)(SG)
December 13, 2018 4 IFP deficiency corrected IN PART (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Daryl Berry, Prisoner ID: 879625)(SG)
December 7, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status. Filer has until 1/7/2019 to correct (Attachments: #1 Habeas IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Daryl Berry, Prisoner ID: 879625)(SG)
December 6, 2018 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Daryl Lamar Berry (NO FILING FEE, NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement)**40 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Daryl Berry, Prisoner ID: 879625)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald R Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daryl Lamar Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?