TIG Insurance Company v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford

Plaintiff: TIG Insurance Company
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Case Number: 2:2018cv01765
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 MINUTE ORDER: The parties' joint request to extend the initial scheduling deadlines is granted and the deadlines are continued 6 weeks as follows:FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/26/2019, Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2019. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
December 14, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint; , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff TIG Insurance Company by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford.(Adams, Matthew)
December 11, 2018 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Galina Kletser Jakobson. Filed by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Jakobson, Galina) Modified firm association/address on 12/12/2018 (DS).
December 11, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Galina Kletser Jakobson on behalf of Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Jakobson, Galina)
December 11, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carl Edward Forsberg on behalf of Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Forsberg, Carl)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/15/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/18/2018. (GT)
December 10, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GT)
December 10, 2018 7 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
December 10, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
December 7, 2018 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Adams, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates identifying Corporate Parents/Affiliates Continental Casualty Company, The Continental Corporation, CNA Financial Corporation, and Loews Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Adams, Matthew) Modified on 12/11/2018 to add corporate parent information (KB).
December 7, 2018 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Adams, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Matthew S. Adams re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Adams, Matthew)
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-27792-2 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5572978), filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIG Insurance Company v. National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Matthew S Adams
Represented By: Carl Edward Forsberg
Represented By: Galina Kletser Jakobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIG Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent W Beecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?