First & Republican Associates LLC v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: First & Republican Associates, LLC and First & Republican Associates LLC
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 and Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01766
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(Eaton, Malaika)
January 14, 2019 Attorneys Robert M Sulkin and Curtis C Isacke added for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company per #5 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
January 11, 2019 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Eaton, Malaika)
January 11, 2019 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Malaika M Eaton on behalf of Defendant Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Eaton, Malaika)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/13/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/6/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
December 17, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by First & Republican Associates LLC (Stein, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) First & Republican Associates LLC Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (SNP) Modified on 12/11/2018 (KB).
December 10, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/17/2018. (SNP)
December 10, 2018 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5573437), filed by First & Republican Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stein, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First & Republican Associates LLC v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Curtis C Isacke
Represented By: Malaika M Eaton
Represented By: Robert M Sulkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First & Republican Associates, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First & Republican Associates LLC
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?