Keane et al v. 40 Years Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Asprey Keane and Christopher Keane
Defendant: 40 Years, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: David Asprey and 40 Years Inc
Counter Defendant: Zoomius, Inc. and Track Intelligence, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Launch Neuroscience Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01768
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #48 Motion for a Status Conference. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 29, 2019 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Weingart filed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey re #48 MOTION for Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14 (PP. 9-239))(St Romain, Jacque)
January 29, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, to #48 MOTION for Status Conference . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(St Romain, Jacque)
January 28, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Joinder of Launch Neuroscience Inc., Zoomius, Inc., and Track Intelligence, Inc. to Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. #18), in Support Thereof Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady added to party Launch Neuroscience Inc(pty:3pd), Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady added to party Track Intelligence, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady added to party Zoomius, Inc.(pty:3pd), filed by Third Party Defendants Launch Neuroscience Inc, Track Intelligence, Inc., Zoomius, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Third Chris Declaration) Noting Date 2/22/2019, (Grady, Douglas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Status Conference , filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane. Noting Date 1/28/2019, (Grady, Douglas)
January 25, 2019 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT and Discovery Plan by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (St Romain, Jacque)
January 25, 2019 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Jacque E. St. Romain re #45 Summons Returned Executed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E (pp. 6-27))(St Romain, Jacque)
January 25, 2019 Filing 45 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Launch Neuroscience Inc on 1/24/2019 (St Romain, Jacque)
January 25, 2019 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Zoomius, Inc. and Track Intelligence, Inc. on 1/4/2019, filed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey. (St Romain, Jacque)
January 22, 2019 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Jacque E. St. Romain filed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. 18) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (pp. 4-37))(St Romain, Jacque)
January 22, 2019 Filing 42 ERRATA re #39 Response to Motion, for Extension of Time for Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (St Romain, Jacque)
January 18, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane, TO RESPONSE to #36 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. 18) (Attachments: #1 Second Grady Declaration, #2 Third Jennifer Declaration, #3 Second Chris Declaration)(Grady, Douglas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Weingart filed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey re #36 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. 18) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H (pp. 7-55))(St Romain, Jacque)
January 16, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, to #36 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. 18). Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(St Romain, Jacque)
January 11, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane, TO RESPONSE to #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Second Jennifer Declaration, #2 Grady Declaration)(Grady, Douglas)
January 11, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 40 Years Inc(a Delaware corporation) (St Romain, Jacque)
January 10, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadlines Pending Ruling on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Dkt. 18), filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane, Third Party Defendants Track Intelligence, Inc., Zoomius, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/18/2019, (Grady, Douglas)
January 9, 2019 Filing 35 Summons Electronically Issued as to Third-Party Defendant Launch Neuroscience Inc. (PM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 34 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #28 Amended Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(St Romain, Jacque)
January 8, 2019 Filing 33 ERRATA re #30 Declaration, by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Asprey, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Certificate of Service)(St Romain, Jacque)
January 8, 2019 Launch Neuroscience Inc added as Third-Party Defendant per #28 First Amended Answer, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint. (PM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Service filed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey re: #29 Response, #30 Declaration of David Asprey and #31 Declaration of Jeffrey Weingart re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (St Romain, Jacque) Modified on 1/8/2019 to add link and language re served documents (PM).
January 7, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Weingart filed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(St Romain, Jacque)
January 7, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION of David Asprey filed by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey re #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(St Romain, Jacque)
January 7, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, David Asprey, Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, to #18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument Requested. (St Romain, Jacque)
January 7, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED ANSWER to (FIRST Amended Answer to Amended) #9 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Zoomius, Inc., Christopher Keane, Track Intelligence, Inc., Jennifer Asprey Keane, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Zoomius, Inc., Christopher Keane, Track Intelligence, Inc., Jennifer Asprey Keane by 40 Years Inc, David Asprey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(St Romain, Jacque)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER denying Defendants' #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injuction. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) Modified on 1/3/2019 - order corrects scriveners errors (LW).
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and to Preserve Evidence ; by Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey. (St Romain, Jacque)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying Defendants' #15 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Jose Dino Vasquez on behalf of Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey. (Vasquez, Jose)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sarah A Pfeiffer for 40 Years Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey P Weingart for Defendant 40 Years Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane, to #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jennifer Asprey Keane, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Keane, #3 Proposed Order)(Grady, Douglas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER re: #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by 40 Years Inc, David Asprey. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, Chief United States District Judge: Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs/Third-Party Plaintiffs filed an Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. #15) on December 19, 2018, at 4:30 p.m. Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants timely filed a notice of Intent to Oppose (Dkt. #19) and, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 65(b)(5), are afforded forty-eight hours to respond. The Court is closed on both Monday, December 24, and Tuesday, December 25. Accordingly, the earliest the parties should anticipate any order on the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is Wednesday, December 26, 2018. (CAO)
December 20, 2018 At the direction of Chambers Noting Date Reset re #17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and to Preserve Evidence : Noting Date 1/4/2019 (TH)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane. (Grady, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/11/2019, (Grady, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and to Preserve Evidence, filed by Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/19/2018, (St Romain, Jacque)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of David Asprey filed by Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(St Romain, Jacque)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/19/2018, (St Romain, Jacque)
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe) Revised Exhibits re #9 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (St Romain, Jacque)
December 19, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #9 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim, was improperly signed by J. Dino Vasquez. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing or file a separate Notice of Appearance for Mr. Vasquez. (PM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Track Intelligence, Inc. (main document) (Attachments: #1 Summons for Zoomius, Inc.)(PM)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sara J. Triplett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5586981 (St Romain, Jacque)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sarah A. Pfeiffer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5586979 (St Romain, Jacque)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey P. Weingart FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Third Party Plaintiffs 40 Years Inc, David Asprey, Counter Claimants 40 Years Inc, David Asprey (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5586978 (St Romain, Jacque)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Jacque Elizabeth St Romain added to party 40 Years Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jacque Elizabeth St Romain added to party David Asprey(pty:dft), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Track Intelligence, Inc., Zoomius, Inc. with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane by David Asprey, 40 Years Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8 (pgs 56-129), #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(St Romain, Jacque)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/11/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/18/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant David Asprey. (PM)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant 40 Years Inc. (PM)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgments by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane (Grady, Douglas)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgements by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane (Grady, Douglas)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiffs Christopher Keane, Jennifer Asprey Keane. (Grady, Douglas)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint, Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
December 10, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgments against defendant(s) 40 Years, Inc., David Asprey with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5573470) Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady added to party Christopher Keane(pty:pla), Attorney Douglas Anderson Grady added to party Jennifer Asprey Keane (pty:pla), filed by Jennifer Asprey Keane, Christopher Keane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Grady, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keane et al v. 40 Years Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: David Asprey
Represented By: Sarah A Pfeiffer
Represented By: Jeffrey P Weingart
Represented By: Jacque Elizabeth St Romain
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: 40 Years Inc
Represented By: Sarah A Pfeiffer
Represented By: Jeffrey P Weingart
Represented By: Jacque Elizabeth St Romain
Represented By: Jose Dino Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40 Years, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Asprey Keane
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Represented By: Anthony R Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Keane
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Represented By: Anthony R Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Zoomius, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Track Intelligence, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Launch Neuroscience Inc
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?