Smith v. Amazon
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Amazon
Case Number: 2:2018cv01780
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to file #1 Proposed Complaint as an amended complaint in Smith v. Amazon, Case No. C18-1607; directing Clerk to terminate plaintiff's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and CLOSE this case. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis set before Judge Theiler, filed by Charmane Smith. (PM)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Charmane Smith. (PM)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; 1. A Civil Cover Sheet is required at the time of filing, pursuant to LCR 3(a). Please complete the enclosed form and sign and date at the red X at the bottom of the document. 2. The plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (IFP) requesting that the fee be waived. An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. To pay the filing fee, please contact the Clerk's Office at (206) 370-8400 to make the payment via credit card. Filer has until 1/11/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff with Civil Cover Sheet and IFP form via USPS) (ST)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 PROPOSED Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charmane Smith. (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE) (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?