Moujtahid et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Jay Gairson, Badr Moujtahid, Fatima Moujtahid and BM
Defendant: L Francis Cissna, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, National Records Center, Jill A Eggleston, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Department of Homeland Security and US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv01789
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by L Francis Cissna, Jill A Eggleston, National Records Center, Kirstjen Nielsen, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Lambert, Michelle)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER LIFTING STAY. The parties shall comply with the following deadlines: Deadline for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint is 2/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/26/2019, Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appropriation Rec'd and PO re resetting deadlines ; filed by Defendants L Francis Cissna, Jill A Eggleston, National Records Center, Kirstjen Nielsen, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Lambert, Michelle)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendants' #13 Motion for a Stay of Deadlines in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. All pending deadlines, including the deadline to answer the complaint, are hereby STAYED and are hereby EXTENDED commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY, filed by Defendants L Francis Cissna, Jill A Eggleston, National Records Center, Kirstjen Nielsen, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Stay re #11 Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges, #1 Complaint,, Deadlines (Lambert, Michelle)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs BM, Jay Gairson, Fatima Moujtahid, to #13 MOTION to Stay re #11 Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges, #1 Complaint,, Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order denying Motion for Stay)(Gairson, Jay)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting parties' #14 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is extended to 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants L Francis Cissna, Jill A Eggleston, National Records Center, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Noting Date 1/15/2019, (Lambert, Michelle)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay re #11 Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges, #1 Complaint,, Deadlines, filed by Defendants L Francis Cissna, Jill A Eggleston, National Records Center, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/25/2019, (Lambert, Michelle)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants L Francis Cissna, Jill A Eggleston, National Records Center, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Lambert, Michelle)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/31/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 REDACTION to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs BM, Jay Gairson, Fatima Moujtahid (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Redacted Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits)(Gairson, Jay)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Department of Homeland Security (main document) (Attachments: #1 Summons - National Records Center, #2 Summons - Kirstjen Nielsen, #3 Summons - L Francis Cissna, #4 Summons - Jill A Eggleston) (PM) Modified on 12/17/2018 - sealed summons as they contain minor child's full name (KB).
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SNP) Modified on 12/17/2018 - sealed summons as they contain minor child's full name (KB).
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Jay Gairson, BM, Fatima Moujtahid SEALED DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Summons of USDHS, #2 Summons of NRC, #3 Summons of Nielsen, #4 Summons of Eggleston, #5 Summons of Cissna)(Gairson, Jay) Modified on 12/17/2018 (KB).
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Declaration of Jay Gairson and Exhibits to Complaint by Plaintiffs Jay Gairson, BM, Fatima Moujtahid (Gairson, Jay) Modified on 12/17/2018 (KB).
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP) Modified on 12/17/2018 (KB).
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
December 13, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, Summons of US Attorney by Plaintiffs Jay Gairson, BM, Fatima Moujtahid (Gairson, Jay) Modified on 12/17/2018 (KB).
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENTS COMPLAINT for declaratory relief and injunctive relief for violation of the Freedom Of Information Act against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5579068) Attorney Jay W. Gairson added to party Jay Gairson(pty:pla), Attorney Jay W. Gairson added to party BM (pty:pla), Attorney Jay W. Gairson added to party Fatima Moujtahid(pty:pla), filed by Jay Gairson, BM, Fatima Moujtahid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Jay Gairson and Exhibits to Complaint)(Gairson, Jay) Modified on 12/17/2018 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moujtahid et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Gairson
Represented By: Jay W. Gairson
Represented By: Jay W Gairson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Badr Moujtahid
Represented By: Jay W. Gairson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Moujtahid
Represented By: Jay W. Gairson
Represented By: Jay W Gairson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BM
Represented By: Jay W Gairson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Records Center
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill A Eggleston
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?