Church v. Expedia Inc et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Church
Defendant: Travelscape, LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com L.P., EAN.com, LP, Hotels.com LP, Travelscape LLC, EAN.com LP and Expedia Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01812
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Deadlines and Limiting Discovery Pending a Decision on Motion to Compel Arbitration re parties' #17 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 25, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Deadlines and Limiting Discovery Pending a Decision on Motion to Compel Arbitration by parties (Calfo, Angelo)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: 5/15/19; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 6/14/19. (AD)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/13/2019. (AD)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James L Ward, Jr for Plaintiff Joseph Church, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John P Linton, Jr for Plaintiff Joseph Church, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ian W Freeman for Plaintiff Joseph Church, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ranee Saunders for Plaintiff Joseph Church, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James L. Ward, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Joseph Church (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5613361 (Berman, Steve)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John P. Linton, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Joseph Church (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5613359 (Berman, Steve)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ian W. Freeman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Joseph Church (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5613356 (Berman, Steve)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ranee Saunders FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Joseph Church (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5613347 (Berman, Steve)
January 7, 2019 Attorneys Patricia Eakes, Emily Dodds Powell for defendants defendants Expedia, Inc., EAN.com, LP, Travelscape, LLC and Hotels.com added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by parties (Calfo, Angelo)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo J Calfo on behalf of Defendants EAN.com LP, Expedia Inc, Hotels.com LP, Travelscape LLC. (Calfo, Angelo)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew M Volk on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Church. (Volk, Andrew)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Expedia Inc, EAN.com LP, Travelscape LLC, and Hotels.com LP. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GT)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
December 18, 2018 Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) EAN.com, LP, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com L.P., Travelscape, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5583612) Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Joseph Church(pty:pla), filed by Joseph Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church v. Expedia Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Church
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: James L Ward, Jr
Represented By: Ian W Freeman
Represented By: John P Linton, Jr
Represented By: Ranee Saunders
Represented By: Andrew M Volk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelscape, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN.com, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotels.com LP
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelscape LLC
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN.com LP
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Inc
Represented By: Patricia A Eakes
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Represented By: Emily Dodds Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?