Shore v. State of Washington et al

Plaintiff: Matthew James Shore
Defendant: King County Prosecutors Office, Department of Health and Social Services, State of Washington and Public Health Seattle and King County
Case Number: 2:2018cv01859
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Mail addressed to Matthew Shore returned as Undeliverable re #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (ST)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 Complaint, filed by Matthew James Shore. Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2019, Noting Date 2/8/2019, (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)(ST)
January 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/16/2019, (ST)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DECLINING SERVICE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND BY JANUARY 16, 2019 by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #5 Complaint. (cc: plaintiff w/amended complaint form by USPS)(ST)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Matthew James Shore against defendant(s) Department of Health and Social Services, King County Prosecutors Office, Public Health Seattle and King County, State of Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, King County Jail)(ST)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. -Per your request, enclosed you will find a pro se packet in order to file a civil matter in this court.- (cc: plaintiff w/pro se packet sent via USPS) (ST)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Tsuchida, filed by Matthew James Shore. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account, #4 Letter from Filer)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shore v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Prosecutors Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Health Seattle and King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew James Shore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?