In re Epipen
In Re: Justin Works and Epipen
Interested Party: Mylan Specialty L.P. and Mylan Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018mc00107
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Kansas. (CDA)
November 16, 2018 Case will be sent to District of Kansas by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. If case is stipulated, the 15 day waiting period does not apply. (CDA)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Transfer Case signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The unopposed motion to transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. (CDA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Philip A. Sechler by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, #9 Declaration, (Perez, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Philip A. Sechler by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, #9 Declaration, (Perez, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Philip A. Sechler filed by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Perez, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his motion to Quash Subpoena by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P. re #6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, #1 MOTION to Quash, #2 MOTION to Transfer Case (Perez, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE, by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P., to #1 MOTION to Quash, #2 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perez, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Its Consent to Justin Work's Motion to Transfer and Brief in Opposition to his Motion to Quash Subpoena, filed by Interested Parties Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Perez, David)
November 7, 2018 Noting Date Set/Reset re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case : Noting Date 11/16/2018, (CDA)
October 30, 2018 Noting Date Set/Reset re #1 MOTION to Quash : Noting Date 11/16/2018. (CDA)
October 30, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY: This case was incorrectly opened as a Civil Case. It has now been reassigned a Miscellaneous Case number. All future pleadings must bear the newly assigned Miscellaneous Case number of 2:18-mc-00107 RSL (CDA)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Petition (Other) ; filed by Plaintiff Justin Works. (Taylor, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Kristin D. Casavant re #1 Petition (Other) by Plaintiff Justin Works (Taylor, Paul) Modified on 10/30/2018 (Includes copy of foreign subpoena) (CDA).
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Michael J. Pineault filed by Plaintiff Justin Works re #2 MOTION to Transfer Case (Taylor, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Plaintiff Justin Works. Noting Date 11/16/2018, (Taylor, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION/MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Receipt # 0981-5525187), filed by Justin Works.(Taylor, Paul) Modified on 10/30/2018 to correct event. (Noted by clerk for 11/16/18) (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Epipen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Justin Works
Represented By: Paul R Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Epipen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mylan Specialty L.P.
Represented By: David A. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: David A. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?