Roberts v. Khounphixay et al
Plaintiff: Joe JW Roberts, Jr
Defendant: Richards, Vilma Khounphixay, Kevin Brown, Lindsay McIntyre, Eric A Rosmith, Fuller, Baxter and Ferabee
Case Number: 2:2019cv00014
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James P Donohue
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
2 Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 Mail addressed to Joe JW Roberts, Jr returned as Undeliverable re #8 Order on IFP and Payments re In Custody Prisoners, #10 Order Directing Service, 11 Order Reassigning Case, #9 Complaint **DO NOT PRINT**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089) (TH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING REFERRAL JUDGE by Clerk William M. McCool. Referral Judge is Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. Donohue's successor, Magistrate Judge Michelle L. Peterson. Cc to MLP. (AE)**0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE Documents served electronically to MCC Pysche Associate Lindsay McIntyre, MCC Psychologist Eric A Rosmith, MCC Special Offender Unit ("SOU") Corrections Officers Baxter and Ferobee, MCC Intensive Management Unit Sergeant Kevin Brown, MCC-SOU Sergeant Fuller, and MCC-SOU Lieutenant Richards on 2/28/19, by Hon. James P. Donohue. (cc: Washington Attorney General's Office)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joe JW Roberts, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**23 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SG)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SG)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for copy of Complaint and exhibits, filed by Plaintiff Joe JW Roberts, Jr. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SG)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Joe JW Roberts, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account, #4 Letter)**99 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SG)
February 4, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter, **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(SG)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Submission of Account History **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(TH)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by plaintiff Joe JW Roberts, Jr. (Docket updated. #3 Letter re IFP Deficiency regenerated to plaintiff.)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089)(ST)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement from Franklin County Jail showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 2/6/2019 to correct. Modified on 1/24/2019 to regenerate document IFP deficiency letter electronically. 1 PAGE **PRINT ALL** (Joe Roberts, Prisoner ID: 394089) (mailed to plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Joe JW Roberts, Jr (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account, #4 Letter from Filer re Current Location)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Khounphixay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vilma Khounphixay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A Rosmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferabee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe JW Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?