iBwave Solutions Inc v. Zhang et al

Plaintiff: iBwave Solutions Inc
Defendant: Yong Zhang and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2019cv00016
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 4/22/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/13/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Emergency Motion for Order to Preserve. signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Does 1-20, Yong Zhang (CDA)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CDA)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gene W Lee for Plaintiff iBwave Solutions Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 7, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (CDA)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gene W. Lee FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff iBwave Solutions Inc. Receipt No. 26EJ72DH0981-5603694 (Davison, Zachary) Modified on 1/7/2019 to correct receipt number (CDA).
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Benoit Courchesne filed by Plaintiff iBwave Solutions Inc. re #3 Emergency MOTION for Order to Preserve (Davison, Zachary)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Order to Preserve, filed by Plaintiff iBwave Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/7/2019, (Davison, Zachary)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Corning Inc. for iBwave Solutions Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by iBwave Solutions Inc. (Davison, Zachary)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Does 1-20, Yong Zhang with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5603657) Attorney Zachary E Davison added to party iBwave Solutions Inc.(pty:pla), filed by iBwave Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Davison, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iBwave Solutions Inc v. Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yong Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iBwave Solutions Inc
Represented By: Heath L Hyatt
Represented By: Judith B Jennison
Represented By: Gene W Lee
Represented By: Zachary E Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?