Klein et al v. Alabama Housing Finance Authority

Plaintiff: Michael Klein and Dennis Lee Burman
Defendant: Alabama Housing Finance Authority
Interested Party: Christine Tavares, Bankruptcy Appeals (SEA), Anzaldua Estate and Tavares Estate
Case Number: 2:2019cv00020
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Appeal NOTED on motion calendar for 5/10/2019 (TH)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Appellant Brief due by 3/25/2019, Appellee Response Brief due by 4/24/2019, Appellant Reply Brief due by 5/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 ROA)(Bankruptcy Appeals (Sea), )Patty Richling
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Record Status Request Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal (ST)
January 9, 2019 NOTICE: Stephen J Baumgarner added to docket as counsel for Alabama Housing Finance Authority.(ST)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER re Filing of Bankruptcy Appeal. (Ad Hoc: Stephen J Baumgarner. Since Mr. Baumgarner was granted PHV status in the bankruptcy case, he will be admitted PHV in this court and added to the docket by the admissions clerk) (ST)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS WAW internal appeal #:19-S001. Bankruptcy Case #16-14901. Adversary Case #18-01002-MLBEntered by Patty Richling(Bankruptcy Appeals (Sea), )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein et al v. Alabama Housing Finance Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Klein
Represented By: Arthur E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee Burman
Represented By: Arthur E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Christine Tavares
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Appeals (SEA)
Represented By: Bankruptcy Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Anzaldua Estate
Represented By: Peter H. Arkison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tavares Estate
Represented By: Rory C. Livesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Housing Finance Authority
Represented By: Lance E Olsen
Represented By: Stephen J Baumgarner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?