Noyes et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert D. Noyes, Beverly L. Noyes, Robert D Noyes and Beverly L Noyes
Defendant: Crane Co., BW/IP, INC., Gardner Denver Inc, Pfizer Inc, William Powell Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Elliott Company, Aurora Pump Company, IMO Industries Inc, General Electric Company, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Carrier Corporation, Lone Star Industries, Inc, Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company, Warren Pumps Inc, Flowserve US Inc, Fryer Knowles Inc, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc, Owens-Illinois Inc., ITT Corporation, Velan Valve Corp, Alfa Laval Inc, CBS Corporation, North Coast Electric Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Warren Pumps LLC, BW/IP Inc, Lone Star Industries Inc, The William Powell Company, Owens-Illinois Inc, Gardner-Denver Inc, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, Crane Co, Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc, Electrolux Home Products Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Fryer-Knowles Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Receipt of #42 Remand Letter to State Court (TH)
January 17, 2019 Filing 42 LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court (SWT) (cc: State Court)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Remand Case to State Court re plaintiffs and defendant Aurora Pump Company's #35 Stipulated Motion. This case is remanded to State Court: King County Cause No. 18-2-56024-1. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(SWT)
January 17, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Carrier Corporation (Vollans, Ryan)
January 17, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan W Vollans on behalf of Defendant Carrier Corporation. (Vollans, Ryan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint; by Fryer-Knowles Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Serko, Alice)
January 16, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Fryer-Knowles Inc (Serko, Alice)
January 16, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Alice Coles Serko on behalf of Defendant Fryer-Knowles Inc. (Serko, Alice)
January 16, 2019 Filing 35 Stipulated MOTION to Remand Case to State Court, filed by Plaintiffs Beverly L Noyes, Robert D Noyes. Noting Date 1/16/2019, (Wright, Kaitlin)
January 15, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lone Star Industries Inc (Hall, Howard (Terry))
January 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Howard (Terry) I. Hall on behalf of Defendant Lone Star Industries Inc. (Hall, Howard (Terry))
January 14, 2019 Attorney Megan S Cook for North Coast Electric Company added; per #26 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
January 14, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Morgan, Shaun)
January 14, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shaun Mary Morgan on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Morgan, Shaun)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
January 14, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc (Reynolds, Rachel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval U.S. Holdings Inc. for Alfa Laval Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Alfa Laval Inc (Rubin, Rachel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by North Coast Electric Company (Steele, Katherine)
January 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine M. Steele on behalf of Defendant North Coast Electric Company. (Steele, Katherine)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ITT Corporation (Gardner, Ronald)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Elliott Company (Gardner, Ronald)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Flowserve US Inc (Carlton, Marc)
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling, LLC for IMO Industries Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries Inc (Horne, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Edward Horne on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc. (Horne, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pfizer Inc (Alkhazov, Marissa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marissa Alkhazov on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BW/IP Inc (Dinsdale, Christine)
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gardner-Denver Inc (Bosworth, Claude)
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Claude Bosworth on behalf of Defendant Gardner-Denver Inc. (Bosworth, Claude)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, a United Kingdom company for Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc (Kopij, Dana)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dana C Kopij on behalf of Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc. (Kopij, Dana)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Edward R Hugo for Defendant Fryer-Knowles Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christina M Glezakos for Defendant Fryer-Knowles Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by William Powell Company (Hicks, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Edward R. Hugo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fryer-Knowles Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5610317 (Johnson, Malika)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christina M. Glezakos FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fryer-Knowles Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5610301 (Johnson, Malika)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corp. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Velan Valve Corp (Tuvim, Mark)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tuvim, Mark)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Velan Valve Corp. (Tuvim, Mark)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tuvim, Mark)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
January 10, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/17/2019. (GT)
January 10, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aurora Pump Company (Uhle, Megan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Uhle, Megan)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-56024-1 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5607781) Attorney Megan Uhle added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft), filed by Aurora Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Jury Demand)(Uhle, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noyes et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Emily Ann Albrecht
Represented By: Marissa Alkhazov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Ryan W Vollans
Represented By: Nicole R. MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries, Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps Inc
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Marc Marshall Carlton
Represented By: Randy J Aliment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer Knowles Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Nicholas R Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc.
Represented By: Gretchen J. Hoog
Represented By: Jackson Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Electric Company
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Megan S Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Represented By: Steven V Rizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc
Represented By: Rachel A Rubin
Represented By: Christine E Dinsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: James D Hicks
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc
Represented By: Gretchen J. Hoog
Represented By: Jackson Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner-Denver Inc
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Represented By: Claude Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Represented By: Barry N. Mesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valve & Controls USA Inc
Represented By: Dana C Kopij
Represented By: Nicholas R Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Erin P Fraser
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Noyes
Represented By: Kaitlin T Wright
Represented By: Craig A Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly L. Noyes
Represented By: Kaitlin T Wright
Represented By: Craig A Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Noyes
Represented By: Kaitlin T Wright
Represented By: Craig A Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly L Noyes
Represented By: Kaitlin T Wright
Represented By: Craig A Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?