Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada v. Anderson et al

Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Defendant: Parker L. Anderson, Krista Anderson, Ivy T. Bolero, Parker L Anderson and Ivy T Bolero
Case Number: 2:2019cv00049
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff's #4 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335); Authorized deposit in the amount of $480,000. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT) (cc: Finance)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING #4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) ; Noting Date 2/1/2019 (KERR)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) , filed by Plaintiff Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Engel, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Parker L Anderson, Krista Anderson, and Ivy T Bolero (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
January 14, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Sun Life Financial, Inc. for Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (Engel, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5610458) Attorney Robert G Engel added to party Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada(pty:pla), filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - M, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Parker Anderson, #4 Summons to Krista Anderson, #5 Summons to Ivy Bolero)(Engel, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Robert G Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy T. Bolero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker L Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy T Bolero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?