Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. Hi-Tech Erectors Corporation
Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington and Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington
Defendant: Hi-Tech Erectors Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00050
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (See plaintiff's #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (SWT)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington (Maxwell, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/21/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Hi-Tech Erectors Corporation (GT)
January 14, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY DAMAGES against defendant(s) Hi-Tech Erectors Corporation (Receipt # 0981-5610602) Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey G Maxwell added to party Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington(pty:pla), filed by Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Hi-Tech Erectors Corporation)(Maxwell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. Hi-Tech Erectors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey G Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Erectors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?