Louis v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jaime S Louis
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Group long term disability plan of Oracle America and Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Oracle America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00056
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Swale, Sarah)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Oracle America Inc, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Swale, Sarah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Insurance Commissioner on 1/29/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jaime S Louis. (Kinney, Jay)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/13/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/20/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM)
February 7, 2019 Attorney Gabriel Baker added as counsel for Defendants Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Oracle America Inc. and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company per #5 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah E Swale on behalf of Defendants Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Oracle America Inc, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Swale, Sarah)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (ST)
January 14, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (ST)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Jaime S Louis. (Kinney, Jay)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Jaime S Louis (Kinney, Jay)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jaime Louis against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5611183) Attorney Jay C. Kinney added to party Jaime S Louis(pty:pla), filed by Jaime S Louis.(Kinney, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louis v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group long term disability plan of Oracle America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for Employees of Oracle America Inc
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime S Louis
Represented By: Jay C. Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?