Johnsen v. Harlan et al

Plaintiff: Richard Lee Johnsen
Defendant: Marlow, Don McDermott, Corrections Employees, Skagit County Community Justice Center, Harlan and Gomez
Case Number: 2:2019cv00058
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Johnsen. Noted by Clerk for 3/29/2019, (TH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Harlan mailed on 2/13/2019 (TH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Gomez mailed on 2/13/2019 (TH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erik Pedersen on behalf of Defendants Gomez, Harlan. (Pedersen, Erik)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Richard Lee Johnsen. Noted by Clerk for 3/8/2019. (PM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from plaintiff re status of case filed by Richard Lee Johnsen (LW)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF #6 AMENDED 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Officer Harlan; Officer Gomez on 2/13/2019. (cc: plaintiff; Skagit County Prosecutor's Office)(ST)
January 30, 2019 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (ST)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Richard Lee Johnsen against defendant(s) Gomez, Harlan (ST)
January 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2019, (ST)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE #4 COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff w/amended 1983 complaint form)(ST)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Richard Lee Johnsen against defendant(s) Corrections Employees, Marlow, Don McDermott, Skagit County Community Justice Center (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Skagit County Jail)(ST)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment sent via USPS. (ST)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Richard Lee Johnsen. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnsen v. Harlan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lee Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skagit County Community Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlan
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gomez
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?