Smith et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Esther Smith, Emmett L. Smith, Yesfir Mikhaylik and Emmett L Smith
Defendant: United States of America and Healthpoint
Case Number: 2:2019cv00060
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Attorney General on 2/26/2019, filed by Plaintiff Emmett L Smith. (Russo, Anthony)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/20/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/27/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 15-116, by Plaintiffs Yesfir Mikhaylik, Emmett L Smith. (Russo, Anthony)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (MET)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
January 15, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5612673) Attorney Anthony Angelo Russo added to party Emmett L. Smith(pty:pla), filed by Emmett L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Russo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Smith
Represented By: Todd M Nelson
Represented By: Anthony Angelo Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett L. Smith
Represented By: Anthony Angelo Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesfir Mikhaylik
Represented By: Todd M Nelson
Represented By: Anthony Angelo Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett L Smith
Represented By: Todd M Nelson
Represented By: Anthony Angelo Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthpoint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?