L.W. v. Renton School District et al
Plaintiff: L W, B W and L.W.
Defendant: Renton School District #403, Victoria Blakeney, Stephen Harris, Shannon Harvey, TIMOTHY SHULTZ and Renton School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00065
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Victoria Blakeney, Stephen Harris, Shannon Harvey, Renton School District, Timothy Shultz.(Hokit, David)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David T. Hokit on behalf of Defendants Victoria Blakeney, Stephen Harris, Shannon Harvey, Renton School District, Timothy Shultz. (Hokit, David)
January 29, 2019 Attorney Sam Chalfant for Victoria Blakeney,Sam Chalfant for Stephen Harris,Sam Chalfant for Shannon Harvey,Sam Chalfant for Renton School District,Sam Chalfant for Timothy Shultz added; per #9 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance ; filed by Defendants Victoria Blakeney, Stephen Harris, Shannon Harvey, Renton School District, Timothy Shultz. (Hokit, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Jinju Park. Filed by Plaintiff L W. (Park, Jinju) Modified firm association on 1/18/2019 (DS).
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Shannon Marie McMinimee on behalf of Plaintiff L W. (McMinimee, Shannon)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Renton School District, Timothy Shultz, Stephen Harris, Victoria Blakeney, and Shannon Harvey, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
January 16, 2019 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. Judge Marsha J. Pechman no longer assigned to case. (GT)
January 16, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (GT) Modified on 1/16/2019 (GT).
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff s B W, L.W. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Park, Jinju) Modified on 1/18/2019 (KB).
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5614565), filed by L.W. , B W. (Park, Jinju) Modified on 1/18/2019 (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.W. v. Renton School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renton School District #403
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Blakeney
Represented By: David T. Hokit
Represented By: Sam Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Harris
Represented By: David T. Hokit
Represented By: Sam Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Harvey
Represented By: David T. Hokit
Represented By: Sam Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY SHULTZ
Represented By: David T. Hokit
Represented By: Sam Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renton School District
Represented By: David T. Hokit
Represented By: Sam Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L W
Represented By: Jinju Park
Represented By: Shannon Marie McMinimee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B W
Represented By: Jinju Park
Represented By: Shannon Marie McMinimee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.W.
Represented By: Jinju Park
Represented By: Shannon Marie McMinimee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?