Howe et al v. Fresco
Plaintiff: Anthony Howe, Howe Art, LLC and Howe Art LLC
Defendant: Zachary Fresco
Case Number: 2:2019cv00075
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #7 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) without prejudice. (AE)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Anthony Howe, Howe Art LLC (Swanson, Paul)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER RESCHEDULING JOINT STATUS REPORT DEADLINE AND RELATED DATES by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/21/2019, Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2019. Declination of Consent Deadline (see Dkt. #3 ) is also extended to 3/28/2019. (KMP)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Anthony Howe, Howe Art LLC (Swanson, Paul)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/21/2019. (KMP)
January 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. Plaintiff's counsel (or Plaintiff, if pro se) is directed to serve a copy of the consent form on counsel for any party subsequently appearing within five (5) days of an appearance of counsel for that party. (KMP)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 2/28/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GT)
January 17, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/24/2019. (GT)
January 17, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against defendant(s) Zachary Fresco with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5616512), filed by Anthony Howe, Howe Art, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Swanson, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howe et al v. Fresco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Howe
Represented By: Rachel Greenlee
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howe Art, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Greenlee
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howe Art LLC
Represented By: Rachel Greenlee
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Represented By: Steven B Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Fresco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?