Reece v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Vicki Reece
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Employee Benefit Plans Committee, The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503) and The Boeing Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00081
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s). Aetna Life Insurance Company, The Boeing Company, The Boeing Company, filed by Vicki Reece.(Crawford, Melton)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 1 day. BENCH TRIAL is set for 2/10/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 5/3/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/14/2019, Discovery completed by 10/15/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/12/2019, Motions in Limine due by 1/13/2020, Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2020, Trial briefs, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 2/3/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate The Boeing Company for Employee Benefit Plans Committee, The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503); Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Employee Benefit Plans Committee, The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503) (Swale, Sarah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Employee Benefit Plans Committee, The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503).(Swale, Sarah)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 1. (Crawford, Melton)
January 30, 2019 Attorney Gabriel Baker for Aetna Life Insurance Company,Gabriel Baker for Employee Benefit Plans Committee,Gabriel Baker for The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503) added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/13/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/20/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503) mailed on 1/29/2019 (Crawford, Melton)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Employee Benefit Plans Committee mailed on 1/29/2019 (Crawford, Melton)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah E Swale on behalf of Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company, Employee Benefit Plans Committee, The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503). (Swale, Sarah)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Aetna Life Insurance Company c/o State of Washington Office of the Insurance Commissioner on 1/23/2019, filed by Plaintiff Vicki Reece. (Crawford, Melton)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Aetna Life Insurance Company, Employee Benefit Plans Committee, The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SNP)
January 18, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5618019) Attorney Melton L Crawford added to party Vicki Reece(pty:pla), filed by Vicki Reece. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Crawford, Melton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reece v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employee Benefit Plans Committee
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company Health and Welfare Benefit Plan (Plan 503)
Represented By: Gabriel Baker
Represented By: Sarah E Swale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Reece
Represented By: Melton L Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?