Hernandez v. Franklin Credit Management Coporation et al
Plaintiff: Nazario Hernandez
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Company, Franklin Credit Management Coporation, Franklin Credit Management Corporation and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00120
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Franklin Credit Management Corporation (Parker, Renee)
January 29, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendants(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/5/2019. (SNP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk's Office to counsel advising of District Court case number, judge assignment re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference. (SNP)
January 29, 2019 Hon. Judge John C. Coughenour added to case. (SNP)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference, filed by Plaintiff Nazario Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Record) Noting Date 2/1/2019, Fee Paid(Bankruptcy Clerk (Sea), ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/29/2019) (SNP). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/29/2019) (SNP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Franklin Credit Management Coporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazario Hernandez
Represented By: Jacob Daniel DeGraaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Company
Represented By: Renee M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Coporation
Represented By: Renee M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Renee M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Renee M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?