Krause v. Expedia Group Inc et al

Plaintiff: Laurie Krause
Defendant: Egencia, LLC, Expedia Group, Inc., Egencia LLC and Expedia Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00123
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Egencia LLC, Expedia Group Inc.(Madden, Patrick)
March 4, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Expedia, Inc., Corporate Parent Expedia Group, Inc. for Egencia LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Egencia LLC, Expedia Group Inc (Nunn, Todd)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: At the request of the parties, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 4/12/2019. All other FRCP 26-related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #17 Stipulated Motion and Order Extending Time to Answer Complaint. The time for defendants Expedia Group, Inc. and Egencia LLC to answer the Complaint in this action is extended to and including 3/25/2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
February 18, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Egencia LLC on 1/31/2019; Expedia Group Inc on 1/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Foty, Don)
February 15, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendants Egencia LLC, Expedia Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/15/2019, (Nunn, Todd)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Note re compliance with LCR 83.2, : Entry docketed in error. (TH)
February 15, 2019 PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR NOTE: Document #13 was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Todd L Nunn is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (TH) Modified on 2/15/2019 to strike filing (TH).
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to BJR. (KMP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 PRAECIPE to attach document Notice of Appearance of Todd Nunn re #13 Notice of Appearance by Defendants Egencia LLC, Expedia Group Inc (Nunn, Todd)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick M Madden on behalf of Defendants Egencia LLC, Expedia Group Inc. (Madden, Patrick)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd L Nunn on behalf of Defendants Egencia LLC, Expedia Group Inc. (Nunn, Todd)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gabriel A Assaad for Petitioner Laurie Krause, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gabriel A. Assaad FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Laurie Krause (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5634009 (Woods, Paul)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/5/2019. (KMP)
January 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #9 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. Plaintiff's counsel (or Plaintiff, if pro se) is directed to serve a copy of the consent form on counsel for any party subsequently appearing within five (5) days of an appearance of counsel for that party. (KMP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 3/12/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Egencia LLC, Expedia Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons Egencia LLC)(KMP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Laurie Krause (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Expedia Group, Inc., #2 Summons as to Egencia, LLC)(Foty, Don)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Don J Foty for Plaintiff Laurie Krause by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Laurie Krause (Woods, Paul)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
January 29, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (GT)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to attach document with corrected signature re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Laurie Krause (Woods, Paul)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Don J. Foty FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Laurie Krause (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5630636 (Woods, Paul)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5630427) Attorney Paul S. Woods added to party Laurie Krause(pty:pla), filed by Laurie Krause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Laurie Krause Consent to Joint Collective Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krause v. Expedia Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egencia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Egencia LLC
Represented By: Todd L Nunn
Represented By: Patrick M Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia Group Inc
Represented By: Todd L Nunn
Represented By: Patrick M Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Krause
Represented By: Paul S. Woods
Represented By: Don J Foty
Represented By: Gabriel A Assaad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?