Brown et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Eric Brown and Jeanette Brown
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00165
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *10 days*. Jury Trial is set for 3/30/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 6/6/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/2/2019, Motions due by 11/1/2019, Discovery completed by 12/2/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/31/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/31/2020, Motions in Limine due by 3/2/2020, Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/25/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/25/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 10. (Nanfelt, Nathan)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nathan L Nanfelt on behalf of Plaintiffs Eric Brown, Jeanette Brown. (Nanfelt, Nathan)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Adams, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Jakobson, Galina)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe) Amended Declaration of Galina Jakovson in Sup of Notice of Removal re #2 Declaration (non motion), by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Jakobson, Galina)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecip) Amended Notice to Plaintiffs' of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice-Other by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Jakobson, Galina)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint; by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Jakobson, Galina)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/13/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
February 6, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (ST)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Eric Brown, Jeanette Brown (Smart, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/12/2019. (ST)
February 5, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiffs of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Adams, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Galina K. Jakobson re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Adams, Matthew)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-58390-0 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5639195), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Brown
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: William Candler Smart
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Brown
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: William Candler Smart
Represented By: Nathan L Nanfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S Adams
Represented By: Galina Kletser Jakobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?