Phillips 66 Company et al v. Sacks
Plaintiff: Manager HR Shared Services and Phillips 66 Company
Defendant: Joel Sacks
Intervenor Defendant: USW Local 12-590
Case Number: 2:2019cv00174
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 PRAECIPE re #11 Declaration, #13 MOTION to Dismiss of USW Local 12-590 by Intervenor Defendant USW Local 12-590 (Attachments: #1 Revised Declaration of Franco-Malone with Ex. A)(Franco-Malone, Danielle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss of USW Local 12-590, filed by Intervenor Defendant USW Local 12-590. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/26/2019, (Franco-Malone, Danielle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Gabriel Westergreen filed by Intervenor Defendant USW Local 12-590 re #10 MOTION to Intervene of USW Local 12-590 Attorney Danielle Franco-Malone added to party USW Local 12-590(pty:intvd) (Franco-Malone, Danielle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Danielle Franco-Malone filed by Intervenor Defendant USW Local 12-590 re #10 MOTION to Intervene of USW Local 12-590 Attorney Danielle Franco-Malone added to party USW Local 12-590(pty:intvd) (Franco-Malone, Danielle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene of USW Local 12-590 Attorney Danielle Franco-Malone added to party USW Local 12-590(pty:intvd), filed by Intervenor Defendant USW Local 12-590. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/19/2019, (Franco-Malone, Danielle)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Joel Sacks.(Cartwright, Diana)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (b)(6). Filed by Defendant Joel Sacks. Noting Date 5/10/2019, (Cartwright, Diana)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Cynthia J Gaddis on behalf of Defendant Joel Sacks. (Gaddis, Cynthia)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/2/2019. (AD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana Sheythe Cartwright on behalf of Defendant Joel Sacks. (Cartwright, Diana)
February 28, 2019 NOTE re Document #4 : Appearance of attorney Diana Cartwright is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (SWT)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (b)(6), filed by Defendant Joel Sacks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/29/2019, (Cartwright, Diana)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Joel Sacks (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
February 6, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/13/2019. (SNP)
February 6, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Phillips 66 for Phillips 66 Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Manager HR Shared Services, Phillips 66 Company (Hawkins, Christine)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against defendant(s) Joel Sacks (Receipt # 0981-5640917), filed by Phillips 66 Company, Manager HR Shared Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Joel Sacks, #6 Summons Dept. of Labor & Industries)(Hawkins, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips 66 Company et al v. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Sacks
Represented By: Cynthia J Gaddis
Represented By: Diana Sheythe Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manager HR Shared Services
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: USW Local 12-590
Represented By: Danielle Franco-Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?