Yosofi et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Zohra rahgozar and Abdul B Yosofi
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00212
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 ***Pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (TH)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi (Henry, Christina)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Vicente Omar Barraza. Filed by Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi. (Barraza, Vicente) Modified address on 3/25/2019 (DS).
March 14, 2019 Reset Deadlines -- Upon the parties' joint request, the initial case scheduling deadlines are reset as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/18/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/25/2019, Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2019. (VE)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/18/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/25/2019, Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 26, 2019 Attorney Fred B Burnside for JP Morgan Chase Bank NA added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Frederick A Haist on behalf of Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Haist, Frederick)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi re #7 Order, #9 Amended Complaint, and Exhibits (Barraza, Vicente)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s). All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND, filed by Abdul B Yosofi, Zohra Rahgozar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Henry, Christina)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vicente Omar Barraza on behalf of Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barraza, Vicente)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Henry, Christina)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Exhibit G by Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi (Henry, Christina)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Exhibit B by Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi (Henry, Christina)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Exhibit A by Plaintiffs Zohra Rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi (Henry, Christina)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Exhibit A, Exhibit B and Exhibit G contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SNP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) JP Morgan Chase Bank NA (SNP)
February 15, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5651041) Attorney Christina Latta Henry added to party Zohra rahgozar(pty:pla), filed by Zohra rahgozar, Abdul B Yosofi. (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit A, #2 SEALED Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 SEALED Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Henry, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yosofi et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zohra rahgozar
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Represented By: Jacob Daniel DeGraaff
Represented By: Vicente Omar Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdul B Yosofi
Represented By: Jacob Daniel DeGraaff
Represented By: Christina Latta Henry
Represented By: Vicente Omar Barraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Frederick A Haist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?