Northwest Administrators Inc v. Fluor Federal Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Fluor Federal Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00215
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Fluor Federal Solutions LLC on 2/26/2019 (Reid, Russell)
March 8, 2019 The parties' stipulated motion for extension, docket no. #6 , is GRANTED, and the deadline for defendant Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC to file and serve a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to April 9, 2019. (KK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. Noting Date 3/7/2019, (Buhite, Russell)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Russell S Buhite on behalf of Defendant Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (Buhite, Russell)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/12/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/26/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Fluor Federal Solutions LLC. (GT)
February 15, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds Pursuant to Audit against defendant(s) Fluor Federal Solutions LLC (Receipt # 0981-5651362), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Fluor Federal Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Federal Solutions LLC
Represented By: Russell S Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?