Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust v. Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust
Defendant: Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00216
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Default against Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company. Signed by Clerk William M. McCool.(LW)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Noelle E. Dwarzski in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Default filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust re #5 MOTION for Default Order (Dwarzski, Noelle)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Order, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/4/2019, (Dwarzski, Noelle)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company on 2/22/2019, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/2/2019. (LC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company. (GT)
February 15, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AGREEMENT AND DELINQUENT CONTRIBUTIONS (ERISA) against defendant(s) Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company (Receipt # 0981-5651715) Attorney Noelle E Dwarzski added to party Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust(pty:pla), filed by Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust v. Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Island Sand and Gravel Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Machinists Pension Trust
Represented By: Noelle E Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?