Northwest Administrators Inc v. Paramount Convention Services Inc

Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Defendant: Paramount Convention Services Inc. and Paramount Convention Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00252
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: added name of defendant served (Paramount Convention Service, Inc.) (PM)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Marlyn Kelly for Paramount Convention Services, Inc. on 3/25/2019, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) Modified on 4/1/2019 to add name of defendant served (PM).
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #5 Motion to Continue Court Dates. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/10/2019, Joint Status Report due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Court Dates, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/27/2019, (Reid, Russell)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/3/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/10/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Paramount Convention Services Inc (SNP)
February 22, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Audit against defendant(s) Paramount Convention Services Inc. (Receipt # 0981-5659114), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators Inc v. Paramount Convention Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators Inc
Represented By: Russell J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Convention Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Convention Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?