Hotes-Aprato v. ACI Northwest Inc

Plaintiff: Jeanette Hotes-Aprato
Defendant: ACI Northwest, Inc. and ACI Northwest Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00269
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 8-10. (Rosato, Ann)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of John A. Safarli filed by Defendant ACI Northwest Inc re #13 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Safarli, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of William Radobenko, Jr. filed by Defendant ACI Northwest Inc re #13 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Safarli, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Change Venue , filed by Defendant ACI Northwest Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/3/2019, (Safarli, John) Modified docket text on 4/12/2019 to add filer (SWT).
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephanie Messplay on behalf of Plaintiff Jeanette Hotes-Aprato. (Messplay, Stephanie)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by ACI Northwest Inc.(Safarli, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Jeanette Hotes-Aprato (Rosato, Ann)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian C Hills for Plaintiff Jeanette Hotes-Aprato, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian C. Hills FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jeanette Hotes-Aprato (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5681717 (Wampold, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/30/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ACI Northwest Inc (Safarli, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Francis S Floyd on behalf of Defendant ACI Northwest Inc. (Floyd, Francis)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (GT)
February 26, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/5/2019. (GT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
February 26, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of John A. Safarli re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant ACI Northwest, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Additional Records)(Safarli, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-03985-0 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5663449) Attorney John A Safarli added to party ACI Northwest, Inc.(pty:dft), filed by ACI Northwest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Safarli, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotes-Aprato v. ACI Northwest Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACI Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: John A Safarli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACI Northwest Inc
Represented By: John A Safarli
Represented By: Francis S Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Hotes-Aprato
Represented By: Felix G Luna
Represented By: Stephanie Messplay
Represented By: Michael Simon Wampold
Represented By: Brian C Hills
Represented By: Ann Heacox Rosato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?