Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse v King et al

Plaintiff: Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse Inc and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse
Defendant: Dylan Wall, Sara White, Glen Yoshioka, Lewis King and Maurice King
3Rd Party Plaintiff: American Marriage Ministries
3Rd Party Defendant: Universal Life Church/ULC Monastery Inc and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00301
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-5 days. (Hodges, Benjamin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Defendants Maurice King, Lewis King, Dylan Wall, Sara White, Glen Yoshioka, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant American Marriage Ministries' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodges, Benjamin)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadline re parties' #16 Stipulation. Parties stipulate that ULC Monastery Seattle respond to American Marriage Ministries' counter claims and third-party claims on 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant American Marriage Ministries' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Galletch, Michael)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE by parties re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Mennemeier, Kelly)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, Inc. on 4/4/2019, filed by Counter Claimant American Marriage Ministries, Defendant American Marriage Ministries, ThirdParty Plaintiff American Marriage Ministries. (Hodges, Benjamin)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Electronically Issued as to third-party defendant Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, Inc. (SWT)
April 3, 2019 Filing 13 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, to Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, Inc. by Counter Claimant American Marriage Ministries, Defendant American Marriage Ministries, ThirdParty Plaintiff American Marriage Ministries (Hodges, Benjamin)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Electronically Issued as to third-party defendant Universal Life Church/ULC Monastery Inc (SWT)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, to Universal Life Church/ULC Monastery, Inc. by Counter Claimant American Marriage Ministries, Defendant American Marriage Ministries, ThirdParty Plaintiff American Marriage Ministries (Hodges, Benjamin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, Counterclaim,, to Universal Life Church Storehouse Monastery, Inc. by Counter Claimant American Marriage Ministries, Defendant American Marriage Ministries, ThirdParty Plaintiff American Marriage Ministries (Hodges, Benjamin)
March 26, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #6 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim: Modified docket text to strike through "crossclaim" (SWT)
March 26, 2019 Attorneys Nancy V. Stephens, Kelly Ann Mennemeier for American Marriage Ministries added; per #6 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim. (SWT)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Marriage Ministries (Hodges, Benjamin)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant American Marriage Ministries' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), filed by Defendants American Marriage Ministries, Maurice King, Lewis King, Dylan Wall, Sara White, Glen Yoshioka. Noting Date 4/19/2019, (Hodges, Benjamin)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims and Third Party Claims with JURY DEMAND Attorney Benjamin J Hodges added to party American Marriage Ministries(pty:dft), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Universal Life Church/UCL Monastery, Inc., Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, Inc. with JURY DEMAND, CROSSCLAIM against defendant Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse by American Marriage Ministries.(Hodges, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 3/28/2019 to strike through "cross claim" (SWT).
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael B Galletch on behalf of Plaintiff Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse. (Galletch, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) American Marriage Ministries, Maurice King, Lewis King, Dylan Wall, Sara White, Glen Yoshioka (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse (Matesky, Michael)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE re #2 Notice to Filer. Plaintiff's counsel contacted the Clerk's Office and indicated that the case does not involve a trademark registered with the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.(ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
March 4, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/11/2019. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (ST)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against defendant(s) American Marriage Ministries, Maurice King, Lewis King, Dylan Wall, Sara White, Glen Yoshioka (Receipt # 0981-5671984), filed by Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 AMM Summons, #3 L King Summons, #4 M King Summons, #5 D Wall Summons, #6 S White Summons, #7 G Yoshioka Summons)(Matesky, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse v King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Yoshioka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: American Marriage Ministries
Represented By: Kelly Ann Mennemeier
Represented By: Nancy V. Stephens
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse Inc
Represented By: Michael B Galletch
Represented By: Michael P Matesky, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse
Represented By: Michael P Matesky, II
Represented By: Michael B Galletch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Universal Life Church/ULC Monastery Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?