DaVita Inc v. Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital et al
Plaintiff: DaVita, Inc. and DaVita Inc
Defendant: Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, f/k/a Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan and Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 2:2019cv00302
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan.(Hawkins, Christine)
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Virginia Mason Health System for Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan (Hawkins, Christine)
April 16, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Jolene Seda filed by Defendants Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hawkins, Christine)
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/10/2019, (Hawkins, Christine)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/6/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/13/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: The Court HEREBY GRANTS parties' #15 Stipulated motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading to the complaint. The deadline to file the responsive pleading is extended to and including April 17, 2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION and Order for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, filed by Defendants Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan. Noting Date 3/21/2019, (Hawkins, Christine)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan on 3/6/2019, filed by Plaintiff DaVita Inc. (Riley, Erin)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, f/k/a Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital on 3/6/2019, filed by Plaintiff DaVita Inc. (Riley, Erin)
March 11, 2019 Attorney Richard J. Birmingham for Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital,Richard J. Birmingham for Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan added; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christine Hawkins on behalf of Defendants Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan. (Hawkins, Christine)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Summons(es) Electronically Re-Issued as to defendant(s) Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan to correct the date on the original Summons(es) issued. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ST)
March 5, 2019 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 **DISREGARD** ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance; Skagit County Jail)(ST) Modified on 3/4/2019. Order posted in wrong case. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Donofrio for Plaintiff DaVita, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brendan S Maher for Plaintiff DaVita, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Corrected name on 3/4/2019 (DS).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter K Stris for Plaintiff DaVita, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Donofrio FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff DaVita, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5672349 (Riley, Erin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brendan S. Maher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff DaVita, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5672332 (Riley, Erin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter K. Stris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff DaVita, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5672322 (Riley, Erin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DaVita, Inc. (Riley, Erin) Modified on 3/6/2019 to identify corporate parent information identified in disclosure statement (KB).
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5671802), filed by DaVita, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Riley, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DaVita Inc v. Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DaVita, Inc.
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Represented By: Erin Maura Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DaVita Inc
Represented By: Gretchen S Obrist
Represented By: Erin Maura Riley
Represented By: Peter K Stris
Represented By: Brendan S Maher
Represented By: Michael Donofrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital, f/k/a Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakima Valley Memorial Hospital Employee Health Care Plan
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Mason Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Birmingham
Represented By: Christine Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?