Landmark Technology A LLC v. Specialty Bottle Inc et al
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A, LLC and Landmark Technology A LLC
Defendant: Specialty Bottle, Inc., Specialty Bottle Supply, LLC, Specialty Bottle Supply LLC and Specialty Bottle Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00311
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Hodges on behalf of Defendants Specialty Bottle Inc, Specialty Bottle Supply LLC. (Hodges, Benjamin)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. (KMP)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/23/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/30/2019, Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2019. (TF)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff Landmark Technology A LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/1/2019, (Lee, John)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/2/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/9/2019. (KMP)
March 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #6 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. Plaintiff's counsel (or Plaintiff, if pro se) is directed to serve a copy of the consent form on counsel for any party subsequently appearing within five (5) days of an appearance of counsel for that party. (KMP)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 4/16/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Specialty Bottle Supply, LLC, Specialty Bottle, Inc. (SG)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (SG)
March 4, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SG)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Landmark Technology A, LLC (Lee, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Landmark Technology A, LLC (Lee, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Specialty Bottle Supply, LLC, Specialty Bottle, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5672934) Attorney John A Lee added to party Landmark Technology A, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Landmark Technology A, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Lee, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology A LLC v. Specialty Bottle Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A, LLC
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A LLC
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Bottle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Bottle Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Bottle Supply LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Bottle Inc
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?