Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC v. HTC America Inc
Plaintiff: LEMAIRE ILLUMINATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00317
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC, to #24 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT HTC AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Barrera, Paul)
April 11, 2019 ***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the remaining deadlines contained in the #21 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended pending the Court's ruling on Defendant HTC America's #24 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay. (VE)
April 8, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate HTC Corporation for HTC America Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by HTC America Inc (McNamara, Antoine)
April 5, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Miguel J. Bombach filed by Defendant HTC America Inc re #24 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT HTC AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(McNamara, Antoine)
April 5, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of David Wiggins filed by Defendant HTC America Inc re #24 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT HTC AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY (McNamara, Antoine)
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT HTC AMERICA, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY, filed by Defendant HTC America Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/3/2019, (McNamara, Antoine)
March 27, 2019 Reset Deadline: Pursuant to the parties' #23 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR HTC AMERICA, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, the time for Defendant HTC America, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/5/2019. (VE)
March 27, 2019 Filing 23 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR HTC AMERICA, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, filed by Defendant HTC America Inc. Noting Date 3/27/2019, (McNamara, Antoine)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/9/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/16/2019, Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2019, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Miguel J Bombach for Defendant HTC America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Y Hurt for defendant HTC America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew Cook Bernstein for defendant HTC America Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Miguel J. Bombach FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant HTC America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5702015 (McNamara, Antoine)
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James Y. Hurt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant HTC America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5702000 (McNamara, Antoine)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew C. Bernstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant HTC America Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5701980 (McNamara, Antoine)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Antoine M McNamara on behalf of Defendant HTC America Inc. (McNamara, Antoine)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on HTC America, Inc. on 3/8/2019, filed by Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC. (Barrera, Paul)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant HTC America Inc (TH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS TO HTC AMERICA, INC. by Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC (Barrera, Paul)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Antonio S Devora for Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katarzyna Brozynski for Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (ST)
March 5, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Antonio S. Devora FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5674755 (Barrera, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2019 to remove capital letters from plaintiff's name. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katarzyna Brozynski FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5674749 (Barrera, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2019 to remove capital letters from plaintiff's name. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC (Barrera, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2019 to remove capital letters from plaintiff's name. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) ; filed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC. (Barrera, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2019 to remove capital letters from plaintiff's name. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Barrera, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2019 to remove capital letters from plaintiff's name. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against defendant(s) HTC America Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5674705), filed by Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Barrera, Paul) Modified on 3/5/2019 to remove capital letters from plaintiff's name. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC v. HTC America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEMAIRE ILLUMINATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Paul Andre Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lemaire Illumination Technologies LLC
Represented By: Paul Andre Barrera
Represented By: Antonio S Devora
Represented By: Katarzyna Brozynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Represented By: Miguel J Bombach
Represented By: James Y Hurt
Represented By: Matthew Cook Bernstein
Represented By: Antoine M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?