Short et al v. Hyundai Motor America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Linda Short, Olivia Parker, Elizabeth Snider and James Twigger
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America Inc and Hyundai Motor America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00318
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of filing of MOTION for Transfer and Coordination or Consolidation; filed by Plaintiffs in the case Musgrave, et al v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc., et al, 4:18-cv-07313-YGR (N.D. Cal) (Original documents filed in MDL 2898) (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Proof of Service) (PM)
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 COMPLAINT - CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5748077), filed by Linda Short, Elizabeth Snider, James Twigger, Olivia Parker.(McDevitt, Ryan)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE re parties' #21 Stipulated MOTION. Case No. 3:19-cv-5193 JLR is consolidated with this action. All future filings shall bear case number 2:19-cv-318 JLR. Plaintiffs' deadline to file consolidated complaint is 4/29/2019, Defendants' deadline to respond to consolidated complaint is 6/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/16/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/29/2019, Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2019, Deadline to complete discovery on class certification is 10/25/2019, Deadline for plaintiffs to file motion for class certification is 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 23, 2019 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Related Actions, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/23/2019, (Cobb, Alicia)
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Olivia Parker, Linda Short re #19 Notice of Pendency of Other Action (McDevitt, Ryan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Central District of California, case number in other court 8:17-cv-00838 ; filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corporation. (Cobb, Alicia)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting parties' #17 Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/21/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/3/2019, Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2019, Deadline to complete discovery on class certification is 9/30/2019, Deadline for plaintiffs to file motion for class certification is 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/16/2019, (Cobb, Alicia)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16(B) AND RULE 23(D)(2) SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: 7/31/19; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 8/30/19. (AD)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/22/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/6/2019. (AD)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting parties' #13 Stipulated Motion to Consolidate and Extend Deadlines to Respond to Complaint: Deadline for all defendants to respond to the Complaint is 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate and Extend Deadlines to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/4/2019, (Cobb, Alicia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Kia Motors Corporation (Cobb, Alicia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Kia Motors Corporation for Kia Motors America Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Kia Motors America Inc (Cobb, Alicia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hyundai Motor Company (Cobb, Alicia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Corporation for Hyundai Motor America Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hyundai Motor America Inc (Cobb, Alicia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alicia Cobb on behalf of Defendants Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corporation. (Cobb, Alicia)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Kia Motors Corporation on 3/14/2019 (McDevitt, Ryan)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Kia Motors America Inc on 3/14/2019 (McDevitt, Ryan)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Hyundai Motor Company on 3/14/2019 (McDevitt, Ryan)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Hyundai Motor America Inc on 3/14/2019 (McDevitt, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically RE-ISSUED as to defendant(s) Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corporation. (Modified on 3/8/19. Summons(es) originally issued were dated 2/5/19 instead of 3/5/19. Summons(es) have been corrected.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ST)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, KIA Motors America Inc, Kia Motors Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ST)
March 5, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -- CLASS ACTION against defendant(s) Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Hyundai Motor Company, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5674799), filed by Linda Short, Olivia Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Kia Motors Corporation, #3 Summons Kia Motors America, #4 Summons Hyundai Motor America, Inc., #5 Summons Hyundai Motor Company)(Sarko, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short et al v. Hyundai Motor America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America Inc
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc
Represented By: Alicia Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Short
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Parker
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Snider
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Twigger
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Benjamin L Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan D Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?