Jeffreys v. United States of America

Petitioner: Gregory D Jeffreys
Respondent: United States of America and I Jacques
Case Number: 2:2019cv00323
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jennifer Vickers re #12 Answer to Amended Petition by Respondents I Jacques, United States of America (Brunner, Helen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Petition by I Jacques, United States of America.(Brunner, Helen)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Civil Process Clerk - U.S. Attorney's Office (SEA) (TH)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon United States Attorney's Office (TH)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Attorney General for the State of Washington (SWT)
April 1, 2019 NOTICE re #7 Order Directing Service. (Clerk contacted by Washington State Attorney General's Office as the service order was erroneously mailed to their office instead of the United States Attorney for the Western District of Washington. Order, petition and exhibits mailed to the United States Attorney for the Western District of Washington via certified mail on this date.)(ST)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Corey Endo on behalf of Petitioner Gregory D Jeffreys. (Endo, Corey)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND RETURN 2241 PETITION AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Served by Certified Mail on 3/27/2019 to United States Attorney General - Washington, DC; Office of the United States Attorney - Western District of Washington. (cc: petitioner; Michael Filipovic - FPD via USPS)(ST)
March 21, 2019 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (ST)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED 2241 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Gregory D Jeffreys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Helen J Brunner on behalf of Respondent United States of America. (Brunner, Helen)
March 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2019, (ST)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND re #3 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: petitioner w/amended 2241 petition form)(ST)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 2241 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Gregory D Jeffreys.( Receipt # SEA094999) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
March 7, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 5.00, Receipt Number SEA094999 (copy of receipt sent to petitioner via USPS) (ST)
March 7, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, (ST)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 4/4/2019 to correct. (cc: plaintiff w/IFP form via USPS) (ST)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Gregory D Jeffreys. (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffreys v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory D Jeffreys
Represented By: Corey Endo
Represented By: Michael Filipovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Helen J Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: I Jacques
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Helen J Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?