Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Jacqueline K.H. Johnson and Jacqueline KH Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00328
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Commissioner of Social Security on 5/3/2019, filed by Plaintiff Jacqueline KH Johnson. (Win, M)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons -02, #2 Summons -03, #3 Summons -04)(KEB)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Jacqueline K H Johnson.(KEB)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge David W. Christel.(KEB)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KEB)
March 7, 2019 Judge David W. Christel added. (SG)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Jacqueline K.H. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Win, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline K.H. Johnson
Represented By: M Tha Win
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline KH Johnson
Represented By: M Tha Win
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?