Genuine Enabling Technology LLC v. Nintendo Co Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Genuine Enabling Technology LLC
Defendant: Nintendo Co Ltd and Nintendo of America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00351
Filed: March 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Lane Polozola for Defendants Nintendo Co Ltd, Nintendo of America Inc. (Polozola, Lane)
March 11, 2019 Clerk received phone call from attorney William T. Hangley who will not be applying for pro hac vice status in this district for this case. (PM)
March 11, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan L McFarland on behalf of Defendants Nintendo Co Ltd, Nintendo of America Inc. (McFarland, Jonathan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jerry A Riedinger on behalf of Defendants Nintendo Co Ltd, Nintendo of America Inc. (Riedinger, Jerry)
March 11, 2019 Filing 48 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Delaware and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
March 11, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP)
March 11, 2019 Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:17-cv-00134.
March 11, 2019 Case transferred to United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. Case transferred electronically. (ceg) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Nintendo of America Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: "Defendant Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington Pursuant to 1406(a)" (Doc. No. #17 ) is GRANTED and this matter is to be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. "Nintendo Co., Ltd.'s Motion and Nintendo of America Inc.'s Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington" (Doc. No. #19 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 2/25/2019. (ceg) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 2/25/2019. (ceg) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney William T. Hangley for Nintendo Co. Ltd. and Nintendo of America Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting D.I. #41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William T. Hangley. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 1/28/2019. (nmg) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 42 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Andrew E. Russell regarding (1) Nintendo's outstanding motions to dismiss and/or transfer (D.I. Nos. 17, 19) and (2) the case schedule recently established in Plaintiff Genuine Enabling Technology's (parallel lawsuit against Sony - re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to [NINTENDO CO., LTD.'S MOTION AND NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON], #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)]. (Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William T. Hangley - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 40 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Karen E. Keller regarding Joint Status Report. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 39 Letter to Counsel from Judge Goldberg regarding Delaware Case Assignments. (gvw) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Josh Calabro. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 5/3/2018. (crb) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Josh Calabro - filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 (Certification of Josh Calabro))(Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
October 25, 2017 Filing 36 Letter to The Honorable Mitchell S. Goldberg from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington. (Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of SUBSEQUENT AUTHORITY by Nintendo of America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of of Subsequent Authority by Nintendo of America Inc. re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)] (Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 33 SUR-REPLY BRIEF in opposition to Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer #17 , #31 filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (gvw) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 32 COMBINED REPLY BRIEF in support of Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer #17 , #31 filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (gvw) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File; granting #30 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk of Court shall docket Defendants' combined reply brief which is attached as "Exhibit A" to Doc. No. #27 . The Clerk shall docket Plaintiff's combined surreply which is attached as "Exhibit 1" to Doc. No. #30 . Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 7/27/17. (gvw) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File /Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Combined Surreply in Opposition to Nintendo of America Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Transfer and Defendants' Motion to Transfer - filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 29 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc. re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to [NINTENDO CO., LTD.'S MOTION AND NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON], #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)]. (Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc. re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)] (Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File a Combined Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer pursuant to 1406(a) and Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 1404 [DI 17; DI 19] - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Reply Brief)(Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #23 Answering Brief in Opposition, #24 Answering Brief in Opposition, /Declaration of Giancarlo L. Scaccia by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 25 DECLARATION re #24 Answering Brief in Opposition, #23 Answering Brief in Opposition, /Declaration of Nghi Nho Nguyen by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 24 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to [NINTENDO CO., LTD.'S MOTION AND NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON] filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2017. (Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Filing 23 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)] filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/20/2017. (Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jerry Riedinger,Jonathan L. McFarland,Lane M. Polozola,David R. Pekarek Krohn for Nintendo Co. Ltd.,Jerry Riedinger,Jonathan L. McFarland,Lane M. Polozola,David R. Pekarek Krohn for Nintendo of America Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (crb) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 5, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (MSG) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00134-MSG, 1:17-cv-00135-MSG (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jerry A. Riedinger, Jonathan L. McFarland, Lane M. Polozola, and David R. Pekarek Krohn filed by Nintendo of America Inc., Nintendo Co. Ltd. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/1/2017. (dlb) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to [NINTENDO CO., LTD.'S MOTION AND NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON], #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)] [DECLARATION OF JONATHAN L. MCFARLAND] by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Exhibit f, #7 Exhibit g, #8 Exhibit h, #9 Exhibit i, #10 Exhibit j, #11 Exhibit k, #12 Exhibit l, #13 Exhibit m, #14 Exhibit n, #15 Exhibit o, #16 Exhibit p, #17 Exhibit q, #18 Exhibit r, #19 Exhibit s, #20 Exhibit t)(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to [NINTENDO CO., LTD.'S MOTION AND NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON], #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)] [DECLARATION OF KRISTOPHER KIEL] by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 20 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #19 MOTION to Transfer Case to [NINTENDO CO., LTD.'S MOTION AND NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON] filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2017. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Transfer Case to [NINTENDO CO., LTD.'S MOTION AND NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON] - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)] filed by Nintendo of America Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2017. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon [DEFENDANT NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE TO THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF WASHINGTON PURSUANT TO 1406(a)] - filed by Nintendo of America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Rule 7.1.1 Certification)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Nintendo Co., Ltd. for Nintendo of America Inc. filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Nintendo Co. Ltd..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jerry A. Riedinger, Jonathan L. McFarland, Lane M. Polozola, and David R. Pekarek Krohn - filed by Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Keller on behalf of Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc. (Keller, Karen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Russell on behalf of Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc. (Russell, Andrew) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Giancarlo L. Scaccia, Peter D. Shapiro, and Christopher M. Gerson for Genuine Enabling Technology LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00135-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00134-VAC-CJB(ceg) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter D. Shapiro, Giancarlo L. Scaccia, and Christopher M. Gerson filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/7/2017. (dlk) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter D. Shapiro, Giancarlo L. Scaccia, and Christopher M. Gerson - filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Peter D. Shapiro, #2 Certification of Giancarlo L. Scaccia, #3 Certification of Christopher M. Gerson)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
March 27, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00134-VAC-CJB, 1:17-cv-00135-VAC-CJB (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to \Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Move Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint until May 30, 2017 filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: All Defendants.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/2/2017. (Polito, Rebecca) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
March 2, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to \Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defedants to Move Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint until May 30, 2017 - filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 28, 2017 Filing 11 Postal Receipt(s) for the mailing of process to Nintendo Co. Ltd. (jcs) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Genuine Enabling Technology LLC : Entry of appearance of attorney Stephen B. Brauerman. Attorney Dana K. Severance and Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP terminated. (Brauerman, Stephen) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 15, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00134-VAC-SRF, 1:17-cv-00135-VAC-SRF (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 15, 2017 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00134-VAC, 1:17-cv-00135-VAC (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Dana K. Severance re #6 Praecipe filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (Severance, Dana) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 6 PRAECIPE filed by Dana Kathryn Severance on behalf of Genuine Enabling Technology LLC requesting Clerk to issue service as to Nintendo Co., Ltd. under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) (Severance, Dana) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 9, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. Nintendo of America Inc. served on 2/8/2017, answer due 3/1/2017. (Severance, Dana) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 9, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Nintendo Co. Ltd. on 2/9/2017. (ceg) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Nintendo of America Inc. on 2/8/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (sar) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (sar) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,219,730;. (sar) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nintendo Co. Ltd., Nintendo of America Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2081116.) - filed by Genuine Enabling Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) [Transferred from ded on 3/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genuine Enabling Technology LLC v. Nintendo Co Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo Co Ltd
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Lane Polozola
Represented By: David R. Pekarek Krohn
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: William T. Hangley
Represented By: Jerry A Riedinger
Represented By: Jonathan L McFarland
Represented By: Andrew Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc
Represented By: Lane Polozola
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: William T. Hangley
Represented By: Jerry A Riedinger
Represented By: Jonathan L McFarland
Represented By: David R. Pekarek Krohn
Represented By: Andrew Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genuine Enabling Technology LLC
Represented By: Dana Kathryn Severance
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Giancarlo L. Scaccia
Represented By: Christopher M. Gerson
Represented By: Peter D. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?