Bohannon v. Allergan-USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carleen Bohannon
Defendant: Allergan-USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., LifeCell Corporation, Allergan-USA Inc, Allergan Inc and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 2:2019cv00417
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Plaintiff's #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (TH)
April 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Carleen Bohannon. (Stephens, Jay)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Allergan Inc, Allergan-USA Inc, LifeCell Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/19/2019, (Baumgardner, Kevin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Carleen Bohannon (Stephens, Jay)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to BJR. (KMP)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Allergan Inc, Allergan-USA Inc, LifeCell Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bone, Jeff)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.. Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/23/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/30/2019. (AE)
March 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #7 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (AE)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 5/7/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeff Bone on behalf of Defendants Allergan Inc, Allergan-USA Inc, LifeCell Corporation. (Bone, Jeff)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SNP)
March 25, 2019 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SNP)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allergan Holdco US, Inc. for LifeCell Corporation; Corporate Parent Allergan Sales, LLC for Allergan-USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Allergan plc for Allergan, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allergan, Inc., Allergan-USA, Inc., LifeCell Corporation (Baumgardner, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Jeff Bone re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Allergan, Inc., Allergan-USA, Inc., LifeCell Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-22398-9-KNT; (Receipt # 0981-5697990), filed by Allergan, Inc., Allergan-USA, Inc., LifeCell Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baumgardner, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bohannon v. Allergan-USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan-USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeCell Corporation
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan-USA Inc
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carleen Bohannon
Represented By: Jay Roderik Stephens
Represented By: Robert Emmett West, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?