Aboda Inc v. Movein Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00614
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 20 FOURTH Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer or Response Deadline to Complaint signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Movein Inc answer due 10/25/2019. (AE)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 THIRD Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer or Response Deadline to Complaint signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Movein Inc response/answer due 10/4/2019. (AE)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Answer or Response Deadline to Complaint signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.Answer/Response due by 9/18/2019. (AE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aboda Inc v. Movein Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?